House
|
11/08/2023
|
Assigned Pa 182'23
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 11/07/2023 02:10 Pm
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Approved By The Governor 11/07/2023 01:02 Pm
|
|
|
House
|
10/31/2023
|
Presented To The Governor 10/26/2023 02:00 Pm
|
|
|
House
|
10/24/2023
|
Bill Ordered Enrolled 10/20/2023
|
|
|
House
|
10/24/2023
|
Returned From Senate Without Amendment
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/19/2023
|
Passed Roll Call # 554 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/17/2023
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/17/2023
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/03/2023
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/03/2023
|
Reported Favorably Without Amendment
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Civil Rights, Judiciary, And Public Safety
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Transmitted
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 141 Yeas 103 Nays 3 Excused 0 Not Voting 4
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2023
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2023
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Bill Electronically Reproduced 05/04/2023
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Criminal Justice
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Introduced By Representative Betsy Coffia
|
|
|