House
|
12/31/2023
|
Assigned Pa 271'23
|
|
|
House
|
12/31/2023
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 12/06/2023 01:14 Pm
|
|
|
House
|
12/31/2023
|
Approved By The Governor 12/06/2023 10:40 Am
|
|
|
House
|
12/31/2023
|
Presented To The Governor 11/27/2023 03:00 Pm
|
|
|
House
|
11/02/2023
|
Bill Ordered Enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
11/02/2023
|
Full Title Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
11/02/2023
|
Roll Call Roll Call # 469 Yeas 97 Nays 12 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
|
|
|
House
|
11/02/2023
|
Senate Substitute (s-1) Concurred In
|
|
|
House
|
10/31/2023
|
Laid Over One Day Under The Rules
|
|
|
House
|
10/31/2023
|
Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-1) With Full Title
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/26/2023
|
Inserted Full Title
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/26/2023
|
Passed Roll Call # 596 Yeas 22 Nays 16 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/24/2023
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/24/2023
|
Substitute (s-1) Concurred In
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/24/2023
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/24/2023
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/24/2023
|
Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Civil Rights, Judiciary, And Public Safety
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2023
|
Transmitted
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 229 Yeas 97 Nays 11 Excused 0 Not Voting 2
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2023
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
06/22/2023
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
06/22/2023
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2023
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2023
|
Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Bill Electronically Reproduced 05/04/2023
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Criminal Justice
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Introduced By Representative Mike Mueller
|
|
|