House
|
05/22/2024
|
Assigned Pa 44'24 With Immediate Effect
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 05/22/2024 01:46 Pm
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Approved By The Governor 05/22/2024 11:00 Am
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Presented To The Governor 05/15/2024 10:38 Am
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
Bill Ordered Enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
Full Title Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
Roll Call Roll Call # 79 Yeas 67 Nays 40 Excused 0 Not Voting 3
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
Senate Substitute (s-1) Concurred In
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Laid Over One Day Under The Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-1) With Immediate Effect And Full Title
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Inserted Full Title
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 25 Yeas 34 Nays 3 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Substitute (s-1) Concurred In
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/01/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Civil Rights, Judiciary, And Public Safety
|
|
|
House
|
10/31/2023
|
Transmitted
|
|
|
House
|
10/31/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 423 Yeas 68 Nays 42 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
House
|
10/31/2023
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
10/25/2023
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
10/25/2023
|
Substitute (h-2) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
10/25/2023
|
Substitute (h-1) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
10/25/2023
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1)
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Bill Electronically Reproduced 05/04/2023
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Introduced By Representative Kara Hope
|
|
|