House
|
03/12/2024
|
Assigned Pa 14'24 With Immediate Effect
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 03/12/2024 11:20 Am
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Approved By The Governor 03/12/2024 10:08 Am
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Presented To The Governor 02/29/2024 02:32 Pm
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Bill Ordered Enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Full Title Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Inserted Full Title
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 26 Yeas 32 Nays 5 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Reported Favorably Without Amendment
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/01/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Civil Rights, Judiciary, And Public Safety
|
|
|
House
|
10/31/2023
|
Transmitted
|
|
|
House
|
10/31/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 424 Yeas 68 Nays 42 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
House
|
10/31/2023
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
10/25/2023
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
10/25/2023
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Bill Electronically Reproduced 05/04/2023
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Introduced By Representative Joey Andrews
|
|
|