Senate | 09/14/2023 | Referred To Committee On Civil Rights, Judiciary, And Public Safety | ||
House | 09/13/2023 | Transmitted | ||
House | 09/13/2023 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 283 Yeas 92 Nays 16 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 | ||
House | 09/13/2023 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 09/12/2023 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 09/12/2023 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 06/14/2023 | Referred To Second Reading | ||
House | 06/14/2023 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | ||
House | 05/16/2023 | Bill Electronically Reproduced 05/11/2023 | ||
House | 05/11/2023 | Referred To Committee On Government Operations | ||
House | 05/11/2023 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 05/11/2023 | Introduced By Representative Samantha Steckloff |