House | 10/24/2023 | Assigned Pa 175'23 With Immediate Effect | ||
House | 10/24/2023 | Filed With Secretary Of State 10/24/2023 11:42 Am | ||
House | 10/24/2023 | Approved By The Governor 10/24/2023 10:10 Am | ||
House | 10/17/2023 | Presented To The Governor 10/17/2023 09:21 Am | ||
House | 10/12/2023 | Bill Ordered Enrolled | ||
House | 10/12/2023 | Full Title Agreed To | ||
House | 10/12/2023 | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title | ||
Senate | 10/12/2023 | Inserted Full Title | ||
Senate | 10/12/2023 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 531 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 | ||
Senate | 10/11/2023 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading | ||
Senate | 10/11/2023 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) | ||
Senate | 10/10/2023 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole | ||
Senate | 10/10/2023 | Rules Suspended | ||
House | 10/04/2023 | Transmitted | ||
House | 10/04/2023 | Title Amended | ||
House | 10/04/2023 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 333 Yeas 76 Nays 32 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 | ||
House | 10/04/2023 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 10/03/2023 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 10/03/2023 | Substitute (h-1) Adopted | ||
House | 10/03/2023 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 09/13/2023 | Referred To Second Reading | ||
House | 09/13/2023 | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) | ||
House | 05/16/2023 | Bill Electronically Reproduced 05/11/2023 | ||
House | 05/11/2023 | Referred To Committee On Tax Policy | ||
House | 05/11/2023 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 05/11/2023 | Introduced By Representative Denise Mentzer |