House
|
06/13/2023
|
Assigned Pa 42'23 With Immediate Effect
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2023
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 06/12/2023 01:10 Pm
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2023
|
Approved By The Governor 06/12/2023 11:24 Am
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2023
|
Presented To The Governor 06/09/2023 11:58 Am
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2023
|
Bill Ordered Enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2023
|
Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 328 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Reported Favorably Without Amendment
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Placed On Immediate Passage
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Veterans And Emergency Services
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Transmitted
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 121 Yeas 104 Nays 3 Excused 0 Not Voting 3
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Bill Electronically Reproduced 05/11/2023
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Military, Veterans And Homeland Security
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Introduced By Representative Julie M. Rogers
|
|
|