House | 11/08/2023 | Assigned Pa 184'23 | ||
House | 11/08/2023 | Filed With Secretary Of State 11/07/2023 02:14 Pm | ||
House | 11/08/2023 | Approved By The Governor 11/07/2023 01:06 Pm | ||
House | 10/31/2023 | Presented To The Governor 10/26/2023 02:08 Pm | ||
House | 10/24/2023 | Bill Ordered Enrolled | ||
House | 10/24/2023 | Full Title Agreed To | ||
House | 10/24/2023 | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Full Title | ||
Senate | 10/24/2023 | Inserted Full Title | ||
Senate | 10/24/2023 | Passed Roll Call # 581 Yeas 20 Nays 18 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 | ||
Senate | 10/19/2023 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading | ||
Senate | 10/19/2023 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) | ||
Senate | 10/12/2023 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole | ||
Senate | 10/12/2023 | Reported Favorably Without Amendment | ||
Senate | 10/03/2023 | Referred To Committee On Elections And Ethics | ||
House | 09/27/2023 | Transmitted | ||
House | 09/27/2023 | Title Amended | ||
House | 09/27/2023 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 322 Yeas 56 Nays 54 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 | ||
House | 09/27/2023 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 09/13/2023 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 09/13/2023 | Substitute (h-2) Adopted | ||
House | 09/13/2023 | Substitute (h-1) Adopted | ||
House | 09/13/2023 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 06/06/2023 | Referred To Second Reading | ||
House | 06/06/2023 | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) | ||
House | 05/17/2023 | Bill Electronically Reproduced 05/16/2023 | ||
House | 05/16/2023 | Referred To Committee On Elections | ||
House | 05/16/2023 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 05/16/2023 | Introduced By Representative Penelope Tsernoglou |