House
|
12/31/2023
|
Assigned Pa 258'23
|
|
|
House
|
12/31/2023
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 12/01/2023 11:16 Am
|
|
|
House
|
12/31/2023
|
Approved By The Governor 11/30/2023 12:30 Pm
|
|
|
House
|
12/31/2023
|
Presented To The Governor 11/21/2023 10:02 Am
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Bill Ordered Enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Full Title Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Roll Call Roll Call # 503 Yeas 56 Nays 53 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Senate Substitute (s-2) Concurred In
|
|
|
House
|
11/02/2023
|
Laid Over One Day Under The Rules
|
|
|
House
|
11/02/2023
|
Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-2) With Full Title
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/02/2023
|
Inserted Full Title
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/02/2023
|
Passed Roll Call # 653 Yeas 20 Nays 18 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/02/2023
|
Placed On Immediate Passage
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/02/2023
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/02/2023
|
Substitute (s-2) Concurred In
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/02/2023
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-2)
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/02/2023
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-2)
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/02/2023
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-2)
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/02/2023
|
Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-2)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Elections And Ethics
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2023
|
Transmitted
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 227 Yeas 56 Nays 52 Excused 0 Not Voting 2
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2023
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2023
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2023
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2023
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2023
|
Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Bill Electronically Reproduced 05/16/2023
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Elections
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Introduced By Representative Betsy Coffia
|
|
|