House
|
12/31/2023
|
Assigned Pa 270'23
|
|
|
House
|
12/31/2023
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 12/01/2023 02:58 Pm
|
|
|
House
|
12/31/2023
|
Approved By The Governor 12/01/2023 02:32 Pm
|
|
|
House
|
12/31/2023
|
Presented To The Governor 11/21/2023 10:08 Am
|
|
|
House
|
11/02/2023
|
Full Title Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
11/02/2023
|
Bill Ordered Enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
11/02/2023
|
Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Full Title
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/02/2023
|
Inserted Full Title
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/02/2023
|
Passed Roll Call # 654 Yeas 20 Nays 18 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/02/2023
|
Placed On Immediate Passage
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/02/2023
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/02/2023
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/02/2023
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/02/2023
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/02/2023
|
Reported Favorably Without Amendment
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/03/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Elections And Ethics
|
|
|
House
|
09/27/2023
|
Transmitted
|
|
|
House
|
09/27/2023
|
Title Amended
|
|
|
House
|
09/27/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 324 Yeas 56 Nays 54 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
House
|
09/27/2023
|
Substitute (h-1) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
09/27/2023
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
09/14/2023
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
09/14/2023
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2023
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2023
|
Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Bill Electronically Reproduced 05/16/2023
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Elections
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Introduced By Representative Julie M. Rogers
|
|
|