House
|
11/08/2023
|
Assigned Pa 186'23 With Immediate Effect
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 11/07/2023 02:18 Pm
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Approved By The Governor 11/07/2023 01:10 Pm
|
|
|
House
|
10/31/2023
|
Presented To The Governor 10/26/2023 02:06 Pm
|
|
|
House
|
10/24/2023
|
Bill Ordered Enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
10/24/2023
|
Full Title Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
10/24/2023
|
Roll Call Roll Call # 392 Yeas 80 Nays 29 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
|
|
|
House
|
10/24/2023
|
Senate Substitute (s-1) Concurred In
|
|
|
House
|
10/18/2023
|
Laid Over One Day Under The Rules
|
|
|
House
|
10/18/2023
|
Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-1) With Immediate Effect And Full Title
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/18/2023
|
Inserted Full Title
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/18/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 543 Yeas 32 Nays 6 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/17/2023
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/17/2023
|
Substitute (s-1) Concurred In
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/17/2023
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/10/2023
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/10/2023
|
Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Economic And Community Development
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2023
|
Transmitted
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 261 Yeas 85 Nays 23 Excused 0 Not Voting 2
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2023
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2023
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2023
|
Substitute (h-1) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2023
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2023
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2023
|
Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1)
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Bill Electronically Reproduced 05/16/2023
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Higher Education
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Introduced By Representative Carol Glanville
|
|
|