House
|
06/06/2024
|
Assigned Pa 51'24 With Immediate Effect
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2024
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 06/06/2024 01:56 Pm
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2024
|
Approved By The Governor 06/06/2024 11:56 Am
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Presented To The Governor 05/28/2024 11:08 Am
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Bill Ordered Enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Full Title Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Roll Call Roll Call # 113 Yeas 98 Nays 9 Excused 0 Not Voting 3
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Senate Substitute (s-4) Concurred In
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Laid Over One Day Under The Rules
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-4) With Full Title
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Inserted Full Title
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Passed Roll Call # 197 Yeas 35 Nays 1 Excused 2 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-4)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Substitute (s-4) Concurred In
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-4)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-4)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-4)
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Health Policy
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Transmitted
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 559 Yeas 57 Nays 50 Excused 0 Not Voting 3
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Placed On Immediate Passage
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
10/31/2023
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
10/31/2023
|
Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Bill Electronically Reproduced 05/16/2023
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Introduced By Representative Natalie Price
|
|
|