House
|
10/24/2023
|
Assigned Pa 153'23 With Immediate Effect
|
|
|
House
|
10/24/2023
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 10/19/2023 11:34 Am
|
|
|
House
|
10/24/2023
|
Approved By The Governor 10/19/2023 09:48 Am
|
|
|
House
|
10/17/2023
|
Presented To The Governor 10/17/2023 09:33 Am
|
|
|
House
|
10/10/2023
|
Bill Ordered Enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
10/10/2023
|
Full Title Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
10/10/2023
|
Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/10/2023
|
Inserted Full Title
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/10/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 505 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/05/2023
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/05/2023
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/28/2023
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/28/2023
|
Reported Favorably Without Amendment
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Veterans And Emergency Services
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2023
|
Transmitted
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 233 Yeas 108 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 2
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2023
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
06/22/2023
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
06/22/2023
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2023
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2023
|
Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Bill Electronically Reproduced 05/18/2023
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Transportation, Mobility And Infrastructure
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Introduced By Representative Jimmie Wilson
|
|
|