Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HB4603 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill May 23, 2023

Engrossed

Bill June 18, 2024
Bill March 13, 2024

Enrolled

Bill June 24, 2024

Chaptered

Bill July 9, 2024