House
|
07/30/2024
|
Assigned Pa 84'24 With Immediate Effect
|
|
|
House
|
07/30/2024
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 07/23/2024 11:36 Am
|
|
|
House
|
07/30/2024
|
Approved By The Governor 07/23/2024 09:36 Am
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2024
|
Presented To The Governor 07/11/2024 01:16 Pm
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2024
|
Bill Ordered Enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2024
|
Title Amendment Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2024
|
Roll Call Roll Call # 290 Yeas 110 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2024
|
Senate Substitute (s-1) Concurred In
|
|
|
House
|
06/25/2024
|
Laid Over One Day Under The Rules
|
|
|
House
|
06/25/2024
|
Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-1) With Immediate Effect And Title Amendment
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2024
|
Title Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2024
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 274 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2024
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2024
|
Substitute (s-1) Concurred In
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2024
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2024
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2024
|
Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Referred To Committee On Veterans And Emergency Services
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Transmitted
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 4 Yeas 105 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 2
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
10/24/2023
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
10/24/2023
|
Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Bill Electronically Reproduced 05/23/2023
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Introduced By Representative David Prestin
|
|
|