House
|
10/24/2023
|
Assigned Pa 160'23
|
|
|
House
|
10/24/2023
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 10/19/2023 11:48 Am
|
|
|
House
|
10/24/2023
|
Approved By The Governor 10/19/2023 10:08 Am
|
|
|
House
|
10/17/2023
|
Presented To The Governor 10/17/2023 09:29 Am
|
|
|
House
|
10/10/2023
|
Bill Ordered Enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
10/10/2023
|
Full Title Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
10/10/2023
|
Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Full Title
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/10/2023
|
Inserted Full Title
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/10/2023
|
Passed Roll Call # 511 Yeas 20 Nays 18 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/05/2023
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/05/2023
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/28/2023
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/28/2023
|
Reported Favorably Without Amendment
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Health Policy
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2023
|
Transmitted
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2023
|
Title Amended
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 257 Yeas 59 Nays 49 Excused 0 Not Voting 2
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2023
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2023
|
Placed On Immediate Passage
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2023
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2023
|
Substitute (h-2) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2023
|
Substitute (h-1) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2023
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2023
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2023
|
Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1)
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Bill Electronically Reproduced 05/23/2023
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Insurance And Financial Services
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Introduced By Representative Matt Koleszar
|
|
|