House | 12/19/2024 | Senate Requests Return | ||
House | 12/12/2024 | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules | ||
House | 12/12/2024 | Returned From Senate With Amendment(s) With Full Title | ||
Senate | 12/12/2024 | Inserted Full Title | ||
Senate | 12/12/2024 | Passed Roll Call # 517 Yeas 26 Nays 10 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 | ||
Senate | 12/12/2024 | Amendment(s) Adopted | ||
Senate | 10/31/2023 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading | ||
Senate | 10/31/2023 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) | ||
Senate | 10/18/2023 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole | ||
Senate | 10/18/2023 | Rules Suspended | ||
House | 10/17/2023 | Transmitted | ||
House | 10/17/2023 | Title Amended | ||
House | 10/17/2023 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 368 Yeas 85 Nays 25 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 | ||
House | 10/17/2023 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 10/12/2023 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 10/12/2023 | Substitute (h-3) Adopted | ||
House | 10/12/2023 | Substitute (h-2) Adopted | ||
House | 10/12/2023 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 09/26/2023 | Referred To Second Reading | ||
House | 09/26/2023 | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-2) | ||
House | 05/24/2023 | Bill Electronically Reproduced 05/23/2023 | ||
House | 05/23/2023 | Referred To Committee On Criminal Justice | ||
House | 05/23/2023 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 05/23/2023 | Introduced By Representative Sarah Lightner |