Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HB4647 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill May 23, 2023

Engrossed

Bill June 26, 2024
Bill October 10, 2023

Enrolled

Bill July 2, 2024

Chaptered

Bill July 25, 2024