Senate | 12/05/2024 | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources And Agriculture | ||
House | 12/03/2024 | Transmitted | ||
House | 12/03/2024 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 367 Yeas 104 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 5 | ||
House | 12/03/2024 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 12/03/2024 | Placed On Immediate Passage | ||
House | 12/03/2024 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 12/03/2024 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Referred To Second Reading | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | ||
House | 05/30/2023 | Bill Electronically Reproduced 05/25/2023 | ||
House | 05/25/2023 | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources, Environment, Tourism And Outdoor Recreation | ||
House | 05/25/2023 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 05/25/2023 | Introduced By Representative Bradley Slagh |