House
|
07/19/2023
|
Assigned Pa 83'23
|
|
|
House
|
07/19/2023
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 07/19/2023 10:24 Am
|
|
|
House
|
07/19/2023
|
Approved By The Governor 07/18/2023 11:28 Am
|
|
|
House
|
07/18/2023
|
Presented To The Governor 07/12/2023 10:03 Am
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2023
|
Bill Ordered Enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2023
|
Roll Call Roll Call # 266 Yeas 56 Nays 52 Excused 0 Not Voting 2
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2023
|
Senate Substitute (s-1) Concurred In
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2023
|
Rule Suspended
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2023
|
Laid Over One Day Under The Rules
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2023
|
Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-1) With Full Title
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
Passed Roll Call # 435 Yeas 29 Nays 8 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
Substitute (s-1) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
Vote Reconsidered
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
Return Granted
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2023
|
Retransmitted
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2023
|
Request Granted
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2023
|
Enrollment Vacated
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2023
|
Senate Requests Return
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2023
|
Bill Ordered Enrolled 06/27/2023
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2023
|
Full Title Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2023
|
Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Full Title
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2023
|
Inserted Full Title
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2023
|
Passed Roll Call # 401 Yeas 29 Nays 8 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2023
|
Placed On Immediate Passage
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2023
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2023
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2023
|
Placed On Order Of General Orders
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2023
|
Discharge Committee Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Elections And Ethics
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
Transmitted
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 160 Yeas 56 Nays 53 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2023
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2023
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2023
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2023
|
Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Bill Electronically Reproduced 06/06/2023
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Elections
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2023
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2023
|
Introduced By Representative Penelope Tsernoglou
|
|
|