House | 12/13/2024 | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules | ||
House | 12/13/2024 | Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-1) With Title Amendment | ||
Senate | 12/13/2024 | Title Amended | ||
Senate | 12/13/2024 | Passed Roll Call # 607 Yeas 33 Nays 0 Excused 5 Not Voting 0 | ||
Senate | 12/13/2024 | Placed On Immediate Passage | ||
Senate | 12/13/2024 | Rules Suspended | ||
Senate | 12/13/2024 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) | ||
Senate | 12/13/2024 | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In | ||
Senate | 12/13/2024 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) | ||
Senate | 12/13/2024 | Placed On Order Of General Orders | ||
Senate | 12/13/2024 | Discharge Committee Approved | ||
Senate | 06/15/2023 | Referred To Committee On Elections And Ethics | ||
House | 06/14/2023 | Transmitted | ||
House | 06/14/2023 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 162 Yeas 56 Nays 53 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 | ||
House | 06/14/2023 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 06/13/2023 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 06/13/2023 | Substitute (h-1) Adopted | ||
House | 06/13/2023 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 06/13/2023 | Referred To Second Reading | ||
House | 06/13/2023 | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) | ||
House | 06/07/2023 | Bill Electronically Reproduced 06/06/2023 | ||
House | 06/06/2023 | Referred To Committee On Elections | ||
House | 06/06/2023 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 06/06/2023 | Introduced By Representative Kara Hope |