Senate | 06/15/2023 | Referred To Committee On Elections And Ethics | ||
House | 06/14/2023 | Transmitted | ||
House | 06/14/2023 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 165 Yeas 56 Nays 53 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 | ||
House | 06/14/2023 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 06/13/2023 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 06/13/2023 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 06/13/2023 | Referred To Second Reading | ||
House | 06/13/2023 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | ||
House | 06/07/2023 | Bill Electronically Reproduced 06/06/2023 | ||
House | 06/06/2023 | Referred To Committee On Elections | ||
House | 06/06/2023 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 06/06/2023 | Introduced By Representative Jason Morgan |