House
|
07/19/2023
|
Assigned Pa 88'23
|
|
|
House
|
07/19/2023
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 07/19/2023 10:34 Am
|
|
|
House
|
07/19/2023
|
Approved By The Governor 07/18/2023 11:38 Am
|
|
|
House
|
07/18/2023
|
Presented To The Governor 07/12/2023 10:09 Am
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2023
|
Bill Ordered Enrolled 06/27/2023
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2023
|
Full Title Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2023
|
Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Full Title
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2023
|
Inserted Full Title
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2023
|
Passed Roll Call # 404 Yeas 31 Nays 6 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2023
|
Placed On Immediate Passage
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2023
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2023
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2023
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2023
|
Placed On Order Of General Orders
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2023
|
Discharge Committee Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Elections And Ethics
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
Transmitted
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 166 Yeas 62 Nays 47 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2023
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2023
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2023
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2023
|
Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Bill Electronically Reproduced 06/06/2023
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Elections
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2023
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2023
|
Introduced By Representative Penelope Tsernoglou
|
|
|