Senate | 10/17/2023 | Referred To Committee On Finance, Insurance, And Consumer Protection | ||
House | 10/11/2023 | Transmitted | ||
House | 10/11/2023 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 345 Yeas 88 Nays 20 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 | ||
House | 10/11/2023 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 10/11/2023 | Placed On Immediate Passage | ||
House | 10/11/2023 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 10/11/2023 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 06/22/2023 | Referred To Second Reading | ||
House | 06/22/2023 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | ||
House | 06/08/2023 | Bill Electronically Reproduced 06/07/2023 | ||
House | 06/07/2023 | Referred To Committee On Insurance And Financial Services | ||
House | 06/07/2023 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 06/07/2023 | Introduced By Representative Joseph Aragona |