Senate | 03/06/2024 | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | Transmitted | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 19 Yeas 104 Nays 3 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Referred To Second Reading | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | ||
House | 06/08/2023 | Bill Electronically Reproduced 06/07/2023 | ||
House | 06/07/2023 | Referred To Committee On Transportation, Mobility And Infrastructure | ||
House | 06/07/2023 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 06/07/2023 | Introduced By Representative Mark Tisdel |