House
|
07/30/2024
|
Assigned Pa 88'24
|
|
|
House
|
07/30/2024
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 07/23/2024 11:44 Am
|
|
|
House
|
07/30/2024
|
Approved By The Governor 07/23/2024 09:44 Am
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2024
|
Presented To The Governor 07/11/2024 01:02 Pm
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2024
|
Bill Ordered Enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2024
|
Title Amendment Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2024
|
Roll Call Roll Call # 291 Yeas 104 Nays 6 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2024
|
Senate Substitute (s-2) Concurred In
|
|
|
House
|
06/25/2024
|
Laid Over One Day Under The Rules
|
|
|
House
|
06/25/2024
|
Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-2) With Title Amendment
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2024
|
Title Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2024
|
Passed Roll Call # 277 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2024
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-2)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2024
|
Substitute (s-2) Concurred In
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2024
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-2)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2024
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-2)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2024
|
Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-2)
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/02/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure
|
|
|
House
|
11/01/2023
|
Transmitted
|
|
|
House
|
11/01/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 436 Yeas 104 Nays 6 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
House
|
11/01/2023
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
10/31/2023
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
10/31/2023
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
09/26/2023
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
09/26/2023
|
Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2023
|
Bill Electronically Reproduced 06/08/2023
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Transportation, Mobility And Infrastructure
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2023
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2023
|
Introduced By Representative Jason Morgan
|
|
|