Senate | 12/18/2024 | Referred To Committee On Government Operations | ||
House | 12/12/2024 | Transmitted | ||
House | 12/12/2024 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 484 Yeas 56 Nays 53 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 | ||
House | 12/12/2024 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 12/12/2024 | Placed On Immediate Passage | ||
House | 12/12/2024 | Substitute (h-1) Adopted | ||
House | 12/12/2024 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 12/12/2024 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 12/05/2024 | Referred To Second Reading | ||
House | 12/05/2024 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | ||
House | 06/14/2023 | Bill Electronically Reproduced 06/13/2023 | ||
House | 06/13/2023 | Referred To Committee On Labor | ||
House | 06/13/2023 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 06/13/2023 | Introduced By Representative Will Snyder |