House
|
08/22/2023
|
Assigned Pa 116'23
|
|
|
House
|
08/22/2023
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 07/27/2023 10:04 Am
|
|
|
House
|
08/22/2023
|
Approved By The Governor 07/26/2023 12:16 Pm
|
|
|
House
|
07/18/2023
|
Presented To The Governor 07/17/2023 11:19 Am
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2023
|
Bill Ordered Enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2023
|
Full Title Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2023
|
Roll Call Roll Call # 267 Yeas 56 Nays 52 Excused 0 Not Voting 2
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2023
|
Senate Substitute (s-1) Concurred In
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2023
|
Rule Suspended
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2023
|
Laid Over One Day Under The Rules
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2023
|
Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-1) With Full Title
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
Inserted Full Title
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
Passed Roll Call # 442 Yeas 20 Nays 17 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
Substitute (s-1) Concurred In
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
Placed On Order Of General Orders
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
Discharge Committee Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
Placed On Immediate Passage
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Education
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2023
|
Transmitted
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 169 Yeas 56 Nays 53 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2023
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2023
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2023
|
Substitute (h-1) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2023
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2023
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2023
|
Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1)
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2023
|
Bill Electronically Reproduced 06/15/2023
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2023
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2023
|
Introduced By Representative Phil Skaggs
|
|
|