House
|
12/31/2023
|
Assigned Pa 310'23 With Immediate Effect
|
|
|
House
|
12/31/2023
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 12/14/2023 10:06 Am
|
|
|
House
|
12/31/2023
|
Approved By The Governor 12/13/2023 04:58 Pm
|
|
|
House
|
12/31/2023
|
Presented To The Governor 12/06/2023 02:24 Pm
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Bill Ordered Enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Full Title Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Inserted Full Title
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 690 Yeas 35 Nays 0 Excused 3 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/07/2023
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/07/2023
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/02/2023
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/02/2023
|
Reported Favorably Without Amendment
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/17/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Civil Rights, Judiciary, And Public Safety
|
|
|
House
|
10/12/2023
|
Transmitted
|
|
|
House
|
10/12/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 353 Yeas 106 Nays 4 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
House
|
10/12/2023
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
10/12/2023
|
Placed On Immediate Passage
|
|
|
House
|
10/12/2023
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
10/12/2023
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
09/13/2023
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
09/13/2023
|
Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2023
|
Bill Electronically Reproduced 06/15/2023
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2023
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2023
|
Introduced By Representative Douglas Wozniak
|
|
|