Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HB4826 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill June 15, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 20, 2024
Bill November 9, 2023

Enrolled

Bill February 22, 2024

Chaptered

Bill February 27, 2024