Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HB4845 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill June 27, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 14, 2024
Bill January 17, 2024

Enrolled

Bill February 20, 2024

Chaptered

Bill February 21, 2024