Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HB4850 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill June 27, 2023

Engrossed

Bill November 8, 2023
Bill October 19, 2023

Enrolled

Bill November 16, 2023

Chaptered

Bill December 18, 2023