Senate | 12/18/2024 | Referred To Committee On Government Operations | ||
House | 12/10/2024 | Transmitted | ||
House | 12/10/2024 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 412 Yeas 56 Nays 52 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 | ||
House | 12/10/2024 | Vote Reconsidered | ||
House | 12/10/2024 | Passed Roll Call # 411 Yeas 57 Nays 50 Excused 0 Not Voting 3 | ||
House | 12/10/2024 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 11/13/2024 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 11/13/2024 | Substitute (h-1) Adopted | ||
House | 11/13/2024 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 09/13/2023 | Referred To Second Reading | ||
House | 09/13/2023 | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) | ||
House | 07/18/2023 | Bill Electronically Reproduced 06/28/2023 | ||
House | 06/28/2023 | Referred To Committee On Local Government And Municipal Finance | ||
House | 06/28/2023 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 06/28/2023 | Introduced By Representative Denise Mentzer |