House
|
12/31/2023
|
Assigned Pa 309'23 With Immediate Effect
|
|
|
House
|
12/31/2023
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 12/14/2023 10:04 Am
|
|
|
House
|
12/31/2023
|
Approved By The Governor 12/13/2023 04:56 Pm
|
|
|
House
|
12/31/2023
|
Presented To The Governor 12/06/2023 02:32 Pm
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Bill Ordered Enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Roll Call Roll Call # 505 Yeas 81 Nays 28 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Senate Substitute (s-3) Concurred In
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Rule Suspended
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Laid Over One Day Under The Rules
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-3) With Immediate Effect
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/07/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 661 Yeas 36 Nays 1 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/02/2023
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-3)
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/02/2023
|
Substitute (s-3) Concurred In
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/02/2023
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-3)
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/02/2023
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/02/2023
|
Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/24/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Local Government
|
|
|
House
|
10/19/2023
|
Transmitted
|
|
|
House
|
10/19/2023
|
Title Amended
|
|
|
House
|
10/19/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 382 Yeas 83 Nays 26 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
|
|
|
House
|
10/19/2023
|
Substitute (h-3) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
10/19/2023
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
10/18/2023
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
10/18/2023
|
Substitute (h-1) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
10/18/2023
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
10/11/2023
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
10/11/2023
|
Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1)
|
|
|
House
|
07/18/2023
|
Bill Electronically Reproduced 06/28/2023
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Local Government And Municipal Finance
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2023
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2023
|
Introduced By Representative Will Snyder
|
|
|