Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HB4862

Introduced
6/28/23  

Caption

Cities: income tax; taxing income of nonresidents; prohibit. Amends secs. 2a, 3, 3a, 3b & 3c, ch. 1 & secs. 11, 13, 15, 16 & 51, ch. 2 of 1964 PA 284 (MCL 141.502a et seq.).

Companion Bills

No companion bills found.

Similar Bills

WV SB518

Exempting non-grantor trusts administered in state from personal income taxation

UT SB0244

Modifications to Income Tax

CO SB138

Permanent Reductions to State Income Tax

AK HB156

Income Tax

AK HB152

Education Tax

PA SB396

In personal income tax, further providing for definitions, providing for elective tax imposed at pass-through entity level and further providing for taxability of partners and for income of a Pennsylvania S corporation.

LA HB567

Provides with respect to various credits, deductions, exclusions, and exemptions associated with corporate income tax (RE DECREASE SD EX See Note)

IA SF565

A bill for an act relating to state and local finance and the administration of the tax and related laws by the department of revenue, and including effective date, applicability, and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 1148.) Effective date: 06/01/2023, 07/01/2023, 01/01/2024, 01/01/2026. Applicability date: 01/01/2023, 07/01/2024.