Senate | 11/26/2024 | Referred To Committee On Civil Rights, Judiciary, And Public Safety | ||
House | 11/14/2024 | Transmitted | ||
House | 11/14/2024 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 355 Yeas 102 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 8 | ||
House | 11/14/2024 | Vote Reconsidered | ||
House | 11/14/2024 | Rule Suspended | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Defeated Roll Call # 3 Yeas 54 Nays 49 Excused 0 Not Voting 5 | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Substitute (h-1) Adopted | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 01/17/2024 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 01/17/2024 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 10/25/2023 | Referred To Second Reading | ||
House | 10/25/2023 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | ||
House | 07/18/2023 | Bill Electronically Reproduced 06/28/2023 | ||
House | 06/28/2023 | Referred To Committee On Judiciary | ||
House | 06/28/2023 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 06/28/2023 | Introduced By Representative Douglas Wozniak |