Senate | 10/31/2023 | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Affairs | ||
House | 10/25/2023 | Transmitted | ||
House | 10/25/2023 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 409 Yeas 107 Nays 2 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 | ||
House | 10/25/2023 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 10/24/2023 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 10/24/2023 | Substitute (h-1) Adopted | ||
House | 10/24/2023 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 10/03/2023 | Referred To Second Reading | ||
House | 10/03/2023 | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) | ||
House | 06/29/2023 | Bill Electronically Reproduced 06/28/2023 | ||
House | 06/28/2023 | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform | ||
House | 06/28/2023 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 06/28/2023 | Introduced By Representative Will Snyder |