Senate | 03/14/2024 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Reported Favorably Without Amendment | ||
Senate | 11/09/2023 | Referred To Committee On Finance, Insurance, And Consumer Protection | ||
House | 11/08/2023 | Transmitted | ||
House | 11/08/2023 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 500 Yeas 80 Nays 29 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 | ||
House | 11/08/2023 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 11/01/2023 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 11/01/2023 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 10/18/2023 | Referred To Second Reading | ||
House | 10/18/2023 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | ||
House | 07/19/2023 | Bill Electronically Reproduced 07/18/2023 | ||
House | 07/18/2023 | Referred To Committee On Tax Policy | ||
House | 07/18/2023 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 07/18/2023 | Introduced By Representative Alabas Farhat |