House
|
12/10/2024
|
Bill Ordered Enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
12/10/2024
|
Full Title Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
12/10/2024
|
Roll Call Roll Call # 400 Yeas 96 Nays 10 Excused 0 Not Voting 4
|
|
|
House
|
12/10/2024
|
Senate Substitute (s-1) Concurred In
|
|
|
House
|
10/15/2024
|
Laid Over One Day Under The Rules
|
|
|
House
|
10/15/2024
|
Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-1) With Full Title
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/08/2024
|
Inserted Full Title
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/08/2024
|
Passed Roll Call # 372 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/08/2024
|
Vote Reconsidered
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/08/2024
|
Passed Roll Call # 367 Yeas 35 Nays 1 Excused 2 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2024
|
Placed On Immediate Passage
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2024
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2024
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2024
|
Substitute (s-1) Concurred In
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2024
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2024
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2024
|
Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred To Committee On Civil Rights, Judiciary, And Public Safety
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Transmitted
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 22 Yeas 94 Nays 13 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment
|
|
|
House
|
08/22/2023
|
Bill Electronically Reproduced 07/20/2023
|
|
|
House
|
07/20/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
07/20/2023
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
07/20/2023
|
Introduced By Representative Emily Dievendorf
|
|
|