Senate | 06/25/2024 | Referred To Committee On Civil Rights, Judiciary, And Public Safety | ||
House | 06/20/2024 | Title Amended | ||
House | 06/20/2024 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 191 Yeas 106 Nays 3 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 | ||
House | 06/20/2024 | Vote Reconsidered | ||
House | 06/20/2024 | Rule Suspended | ||
House | 06/20/2024 | Transmitted | ||
House | 03/19/2024 | Defeated Roll Call # 29 Yeas 53 Nays 44 Excused 0 Not Voting 11 | ||
House | 03/19/2024 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 03/19/2024 | Placed On Immediate Passage | ||
House | 03/19/2024 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 03/19/2024 | Substitute (h-4) Adopted | ||
House | 03/19/2024 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Referred To Second Reading | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-4) | ||
House | 08/24/2023 | Bill Electronically Reproduced 08/23/2023 | ||
House | 08/23/2023 | Referred To Committee On Government Operations | ||
House | 08/23/2023 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 08/23/2023 | Introduced By Representative Noah Arbit |