House
|
12/10/2024
|
Assigned Pa 161'24
|
|
|
House
|
12/10/2024
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 12/10/2024 11:15 Am
|
|
|
House
|
12/10/2024
|
Approved By The Governor 12/10/2024 10:30 Am
|
|
|
House
|
12/10/2024
|
Presented To The Governor 12/06/2024 02:58 Pm
|
|
|
House
|
12/03/2024
|
Bill Ordered Enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
12/03/2024
|
Title Amendment Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
12/03/2024
|
Roll Call Roll Call # 364 Yeas 65 Nays 39 Excused 0 Not Voting 6
|
|
|
House
|
12/03/2024
|
Senate Substitute (s-5) Concurred In
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2024
|
Laid Over One Day Under The Rules
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2024
|
Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-5) With Title Amendment
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/07/2024
|
Passed Roll Call # 403 Yeas 23 Nays 15 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/07/2024
|
Title Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/08/2024
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-5)
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/08/2024
|
Substitute (s-5) Concurred In
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/08/2024
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-5)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2024
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-3)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2024
|
Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-3)
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Transmitted
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 573 Yeas 81 Nays 26 Excused 0 Not Voting 3
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Placed On Immediate Passage
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Substitute (h-1) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Placed On Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Motion To Discharge Committee Approved
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2023
|
Notice Given To Discharge Committee
|
|
|
House
|
08/24/2023
|
Bill Electronically Reproduced 08/23/2023
|
|
|
House
|
08/23/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
|
|
|
House
|
08/23/2023
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
08/23/2023
|
Introduced By Representative Nate Shannon
|
|
|