Senate | 12/05/2024 | Referred To Committee On Health Policy | ||
House | 12/03/2024 | Transmitted | ||
House | 12/03/2024 | Title Amended | ||
House | 12/03/2024 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 368 Yeas 76 Nays 29 Excused 0 Not Voting 5 | ||
House | 12/03/2024 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 12/03/2024 | Placed On Immediate Passage | ||
House | 12/03/2024 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 12/03/2024 | Substitute (h-3) Adopted | ||
House | 12/03/2024 | Substitute (h-2) Adopted | ||
House | 12/03/2024 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Referred To Second Reading | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-2) | ||
House | 09/12/2023 | Bill Electronically Reproduced 09/07/2023 | ||
House | 09/07/2023 | Referred To Committee On Insurance And Financial Services | ||
House | 09/07/2023 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 09/07/2023 | Introduced By Representative Dale Zorn |