House | 12/31/2023 | Assigned Pa 204'23 | ||
House | 12/31/2023 | Filed With Secretary Of State 11/22/2023 01:10 Pm | ||
House | 12/31/2023 | Approved By The Governor 11/21/2023 01:10 Pm | ||
House | 12/31/2023 | Presented To The Governor 11/17/2023 09:38 Am | ||
House | 11/08/2023 | Bill Ordered Enrolled | ||
House | 11/08/2023 | Full Title Agreed To | ||
House | 11/08/2023 | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Full Title | ||
Senate | 11/07/2023 | Inserted Full Title | ||
Senate | 11/07/2023 | Passed Roll Call # 667 Yeas 20 Nays 17 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 | ||
Senate | 11/07/2023 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading | ||
Senate | 11/07/2023 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) | ||
Senate | 11/07/2023 | Rules Suspended | ||
Senate | 11/07/2023 | Placed On Immediate Passage | ||
Senate | 11/02/2023 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole | ||
House | 11/01/2023 | Transmitted | ||
House | 11/01/2023 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 464 Yeas 56 Nays 54 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 | ||
House | 11/01/2023 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 11/01/2023 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 11/01/2023 | Substitute (h-1) Adopted | ||
House | 11/01/2023 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 09/20/2023 | Referred To Second Reading | ||
House | 09/20/2023 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | ||
House | 09/12/2023 | Bill Electronically Reproduced 09/07/2023 | ||
House | 09/07/2023 | Referred To Committee On Health Policy | ||
House | 09/07/2023 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 09/07/2023 | Introduced By Representative Natalie Price |