House | 10/11/2023 | Postponed For The Day | ||
House | 10/11/2023 | Amended | ||
House | 10/11/2023 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 10/04/2023 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 10/04/2023 | Substitute (h-2) Adopted And Amended | ||
House | 10/04/2023 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 09/28/2023 | Referred To Second Reading | ||
House | 09/28/2023 | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-2) | ||
House | 09/13/2023 | Bill Electronically Reproduced 09/12/2023 | ||
House | 09/12/2023 | Referred To Committee On Tax Policy | ||
House | 09/12/2023 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 09/12/2023 | Introduced By Representative Stephanie A. Young |