House
|
12/31/2023
|
Assigned Pa 268'23
|
|
|
House
|
12/31/2023
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 12/01/2023 11:36 Am
|
|
|
House
|
12/31/2023
|
Approved By The Governor 11/30/2023 12:50 Pm
|
|
|
House
|
12/31/2023
|
Presented To The Governor 11/21/2023 09:48 Am
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Bill Ordered Enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Title Amendment Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Roll Call Roll Call # 504 Yeas 56 Nays 53 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Senate Substitute (s-2) Concurred In
|
|
|
House
|
11/02/2023
|
Laid Over One Day Under The Rules
|
|
|
House
|
11/02/2023
|
Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-2) With Title Amendment
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/02/2023
|
Title Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/02/2023
|
Passed Roll Call # 641 Yeas 24 Nays 14 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/02/2023
|
Placed On Immediate Passage
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/02/2023
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/02/2023
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-2)
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/02/2023
|
Substitute (s-2) Concurred In
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/02/2023
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-2)
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/02/2023
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/02/2023
|
Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/10/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Elections And Ethics
|
|
|
House
|
10/04/2023
|
Transmitted
|
|
|
House
|
10/04/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 334 Yeas 56 Nays 52 Excused 0 Not Voting 2
|
|
|
House
|
10/04/2023
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
10/04/2023
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
10/03/2023
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
10/03/2023
|
Substitute (h-1) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
10/03/2023
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
10/03/2023
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
10/03/2023
|
Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1)
|
|
|
House
|
09/19/2023
|
Bill Electronically Reproduced 09/14/2023
|
|
|
House
|
09/14/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Elections
|
|
|
House
|
09/14/2023
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
09/14/2023
|
Introduced By Representative Penelope Tsernoglou
|
|
|