House
|
10/03/2023
|
Assigned Pa 139'23 With Immediate Effect
|
|
|
House
|
10/03/2023
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 09/29/2023 01:36 Pm
|
|
|
House
|
10/03/2023
|
Approved By The Governor 09/29/2023 11:38 Am
|
|
|
House
|
09/28/2023
|
Presented To The Governor 09/28/2023 05:12 Pm
|
|
|
House
|
09/27/2023
|
Bill Ordered Enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
09/27/2023
|
Full Title Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
09/27/2023
|
Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/27/2023
|
Inserted Full Title
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/27/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 484 Yeas 20 Nays 18 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/26/2023
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/26/2023
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/26/2023
|
Placed On Order Of General Orders
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/26/2023
|
Discharge Committee Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/20/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
09/19/2023
|
Transmitted
|
|
|
House
|
09/19/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 289 Yeas 56 Nays 54 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
House
|
09/19/2023
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
09/19/2023
|
Placed On Immediate Passage
|
|
|
House
|
09/19/2023
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
09/19/2023
|
Substitute (h-1) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
09/19/2023
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
09/19/2023
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
09/19/2023
|
Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1)
|
|
|
House
|
09/19/2023
|
Bill Electronically Reproduced 09/14/2023
|
|
|
House
|
09/14/2023
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
09/14/2023
|
Introduced By Representative Will Snyder
|
|
|