Senate | 06/13/2024 | Referred To Committee On Health Policy | ||
House | 06/11/2024 | Transmitted | ||
House | 06/11/2024 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 151 Yeas 105 Nays 4 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 | ||
House | 06/11/2024 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 06/04/2024 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 06/04/2024 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 05/22/2024 | Referred To Second Reading | ||
House | 05/22/2024 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | ||
House | 09/27/2023 | Bill Electronically Reproduced 09/26/2023 | ||
House | 09/26/2023 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 09/26/2023 | Introduced By Representative Mike Mueller |