Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HB5060 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill September 28, 2023

Engrossed

Bill December 11, 2024
Bill June 25, 2024

Enrolled

Bill December 18, 2024

Chaptered

Bill January 17, 2025