House
|
12/31/2023
|
Assigned Pa 312'23
|
|
|
House
|
12/31/2023
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 12/14/2023 10:10 Am
|
|
|
House
|
12/31/2023
|
Approved By The Governor 12/13/2023 05:02 Pm
|
|
|
House
|
12/31/2023
|
Presented To The Governor 12/06/2023 02:34 Pm
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Bill Ordered Enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Full Title Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Inserted Full Title
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Passed Roll Call # 697 Yeas 24 Nays 11 Excused 3 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Placed On Immediate Passage
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/07/2023
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/07/2023
|
Reported Favorably Without Amendment
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/24/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Economic And Community Development
|
|
|
House
|
10/19/2023
|
Transmitted
|
|
|
House
|
10/19/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 383 Yeas 63 Nays 46 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
|
|
|
House
|
10/19/2023
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
10/18/2023
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
10/18/2023
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
10/11/2023
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
10/11/2023
|
Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment
|
|
|
House
|
10/04/2023
|
Bill Electronically Reproduced 10/03/2023
|
|
|
House
|
10/03/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Local Government And Municipal Finance
|
|
|
House
|
10/03/2023
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
10/03/2023
|
Introduced By Representative Will Snyder
|
|
|