Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HB5120 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill October 10, 2023

Engrossed

Bill November 8, 2023
Bill November 3, 2023

Enrolled

Bill November 16, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis May 15, 2024

Chaptered

Bill November 30, 2023